MUDEFORD WOOD COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1141612
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £113.68k £311.06k £90.92k £90.60k £84.46k
Total expenditure £68.28k £64.19k £103.34k £103.36k £91.52k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £18.00k £171.50k N/A N/A £48.95k