BRITISH GEORGIAN ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1141810
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £38.13k £51.20k £12.50k £10.00k £18.75k
Total expenditure £52.08k £47.30k £10.73k £17.82k £24.24k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A