Accounts and annual returns LUSOFONIA ADVICE AND SUPPORT SERVICES AGENCY (LASSA);LUSOFONIA AND LASSA

Charity number: 1143327
Charity reporting is overdue by 478 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 113 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 113 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 478 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 478 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 April 2021 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 12 April 2021 437 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required