LUSOFONIA ADVICE AND SUPPORT SERVICES AGENCY (LASSA);LUSOFONIA AND LASSA

Charity number: 1143327
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.05k £3.90k £2.78k £1.71k £2.59k
Total expenditure £869 £1.12k £1.07k £857 £929
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A