BRIDGNORTH COMMUNITY TRANSPORT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a community transport service for those inhabitants of south-east Shropshire who are in need of such a service because of age, sickness or disability (mental or physical) or poverty or a lack of availability of adequate and safe public transport. We do this with our own wheelchair-accessible minibuses and through taking bookings for the local voluntary car scheme.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £33,577 from 7 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Shropshire
Governance
- 20 May 2011: Standard registration
- 19 December 2022: Funds received from 1038275 BRIDGNORTH OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE AND GOOD NEIGHBOUR...
- BRIDGNORTH COMMUNITY TRANSPORT (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Martin Meehan | Chair | 06 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Christian Lea | Trustee | 26 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elliott Lynch | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Lomas | Trustee | 16 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Brian Stuart Jones | Trustee | 25 June 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.31k | £43.32k | £45.72k | £54.43k | £42.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.23k | £39.47k | £43.80k | £55.05k | £62.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £30.84k | £39.47k | £36.05k | £38.35k | £33.58k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INCORPORATED 14/03/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE COMPANY IS TO PROVIDE A COMMUNITY TRANSPORT SERVICE FOR SUCH OF THE INHABITANTS OF SHROPSHIRE AND ENVIRONS WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH A SERVICE BECAUSE OF AGE, SICKNESS OR DISABILITY (MENTAL OR PHYSICAL) OR POVERTY OR A LACK OF AVAILABILITY OF ADEQUATE AND SAFE PUBLIC TRANSPORT SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 St. Johns Street
Bridgnorth
WV15 6AG
- Phone:
- 01746 768539
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window