Financial history FRIENDS OF BIRKENHEAD COUNCIL KENNELS

Charity number: 1143967
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £184.38k £164.48k £179.87k £346.78k £146.04k
Total expenditure £189.46k £165.34k £177.55k £177.51k £190.00k
Income from government contracts £97.61k £97.61k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £115.33k £82.60k