AFRICAN COMMUNITY ACTION

Charity number: 1143218
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/04/2016 28/04/2017 28/04/2018 28/04/2019 28/04/2020
Total gross income £1.55k £1.24k £931 £11.23k £8.73k
Total expenditure £311 £311 £751 £8.73k £7.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A