Financial history WOODLANDS QUAKER HOME

Charity number: 1141622
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.60m £1.66m £1.69m £1.86m £1.90m
Total expenditure £1.59m £1.66m £1.70m £1.86m £1.85m
Income from government contracts £214.99k £331.17k £263.33k £192.08k £261.92k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £87.52k £80.89k
Income - Donations and legacies £33.41k £10.44k £9.83k £12.02k £5.14k
Income - Other trading activities £6.44k £6.70k £6.37k £6.32k £6.30k
Income - Charitable activities £1.55m £1.64m £1.66m £1.84m £1.88m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £8.27k £8.35k £8.57k £7.35k £12.16k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £27.71k £1.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.59m £1.65m £1.70m £1.86m £1.85m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £989 £1.41k £1.55k £1.13k
Expenditure - Governance £8.04k £10.40k £7.70k £7.30k £8.09k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £989 £1.41k £1.55k £1.13k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0