RAMLUXMI CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1142901
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Relief of sickness on poor young and elderly people by setting up medical camps,providing financial assistance,and providing financial assistance for poor children for their educational and living needs in Sri Lanka and India. Providing financial assistance to renovate the Saiva temples,schools and community centres which has been damaged by the recent civil war in Sri Lanka.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2021

Total income: £30,913
Total expenditure: £27,915

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex
  • Throughout London
  • India
  • Sri Lanka

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 July 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • RCF (Working name)
  • RAMA CHARITABLE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
  • RAMLUXMI (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Subakaran Balasubramaniam Trustee 07 October 2021
None on record
Dr VELAYUTHAM SANKARANARAYANAN PILLAI Trustee 07 October 2021
None on record
Vyramuthu Rattinam Loganathan Trustee 07 October 2021
None on record
Kugan Cassius Ramanathan Trustee 15 July 2011
None on record
MR VYRAMUTTU RATTINAM RAMANATHNA FINSTSMM,MINSTLM,CERTPFS,CERTCII(MP Trustee 25 March 2011
None on record
VIJEYALADCHUMY RAMANATHAN Trustee 25 March 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £24.82k £45.12k £28.23k £22.19k £30.91k
Total expenditure £24.18k £37.06k £31.83k £28.30k £27.92k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £6.30k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 23 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 23 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 17 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 30 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 29 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 29 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 05 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
3 The Orchard
WICKFORD
Essex
SS12 0HB
Phone:
00 44 7956 369557
Website:

No information available