SUSSEX CLUBS FOR YOUNG PEOPLE LIMITED

Charity number: 1142272
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 30 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 January 2017 On time Download