Trustees SUSSEX CLUBS FOR YOUNG PEOPLE LIMITED

Charity number: 1142272
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter Gooch Chair 27 January 2021
None on record
Thomas Bassett Trustee 23 February 2022
None on record
Adam McHale Trustee 23 February 2022
None on record
Christina Fuentes Tibbitt Trustee 22 February 2021
None on record
Andre Benham Trustee 19 May 2018
None on record
JACQUELINE COOPER Trustee 15 April 2011
BURGESS HILL YOUTH
Received: On time
SUSAN ROBERTSON Trustee 15 April 2011
None on record