THE CAPTAINS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support organisations & individuals affected by circumstances outside their control. We aim to help & encourage others around them to overcome difficulties they'll face as a result. We mainly support projects on the Wirral, focusing on raising funds for cancer and health related charities allowing them to make the lives of those affected more comfortable & help them to conquer their condition.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Liverpool City
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 08 December 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Graham Crowden | Chair | 30 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Crowden | Trustee | 04 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARC JOHNATHAN HAYES-GREEN | Trustee | 19 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.80k | £40.14k | £43.20k | £1.25k | £108.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.20k | £24.53k | £46.56k | £7.85k | £106.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 01 October 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 01 October 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 28 March 2024 | 180 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 13 October 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 13 October 2020 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25/03/2011
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND THE INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE SAME PRIMARILY TO THE SUPPORTING OF CANCER AND OTHER HEALTH RELATED CHARITIES AND FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THEY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tudor Gate
Noctorum Lane
PRENTON
Wirral
CH43 9UA
- Phone:
- 01516530345
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window