ABORTION SUPPORT NETWORK

Charity number: 1142120
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 01 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 14 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 24 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 24 June 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 20 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 23 August 2016 On time Download