Financial history ABORTION SUPPORT NETWORK

Charity number: 1142120
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £212.01k £239.25k £262.58k £364.62k £455.94k
Total expenditure £146.07k £208.68k £213.63k £299.46k £367.91k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A