ABORTION SUPPORT NETWORK

Charity number: 1142120
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Charlotte Miriam Rothschild Fischer Trustee 29 July 2020
LORD BROCK TRUST Received: On time
Sophie Bridge Trustee 12 May 2021 None on record
Jane St Pier Trustee 13 May 2021 None on record
Sarah Donaldson Wootton Trustee 29 July 2020 None on record
Victoria Elliott Trustee 13 May 2021 None on record
Sangeetha Navaratnam-Blair Trustee 13 May 2021 None on record
Sally Sheldon Trustee 22 October 2018 None on record
Paula Hamilton Trustee 10 May 2018 None on record
Jema Kate Davis Trustee 03 December 2018 None on record
CAROLINE KELLY Trustee 25 July 2013
OASIS CHILDCARE CENTRE LIMITED Received: On time