THE MASTER AND FELLOWS OF DARWIN COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE

Charity number: 1141105
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Darwin College is a higher-education institution incorporated by Royal Charter within the University of Cambridge. Its purpose as a charitable institution is to advance education, learning, and research in the University, and to provide for members a College where they may work for postgraduate Degrees or carry out postgraduate or other special studies.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 April 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • DARWIN COLLEGE, CAMBRIDGE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Michael Russell Wheldon Rands Chair 01 October 2020
BIRDLIFE INTERNATIONAL
Received: On time
Professor Angela Mary Wood Trustee 01 December 2024
None on record
Sigurdur Asar Martinsson Trustee 19 November 2024
None on record
Professor Christopher Guy Sandbrook Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
Pradeep Debata Trustee 10 July 2024
None on record
Joshua Bickler Trustee 15 November 2023
None on record
Professor Christine van Ruymbeke Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
PROFESSOR ALAN FRANK BLACKWELL Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
Professor James Benedict Rowe Trustee 01 October 2019
None on record
PROFESSOR Fiona Eve Karet Trustee 01 October 2018
None on record
JOHN TANNATT DIX Trustee 01 December 2014
None on record
Dr Duncan James Needham Trustee 01 December 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £6.62m £7.16m £8.09m £8.30m £10.01m
Total expenditure £5.70m £5.81m £6.61m £7.50m £7.38m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £81.25k £114.99k N/A N/A £354.80k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.13m £2.01m £1.71m £750.21k £1.60m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £4.59m £4.44m £5.63m £6.64m £6.90m
Income - Endowments £226.00k £182.00k £0 £184.00k £848.00k
Income - Investment £1.04m £777.71k £754.74k £902.87k £1.52m
Income - Other £81.25k £114.99k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £406.81k £1.39m £1.28m £3.38k £67.61k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.31m £5.50m £6.28m £7.16m £7.21m
Expenditure - Raising funds £389.38k £306.57k £335.17k £344.65k £172.97k
Expenditure - Governance £40.27k £84.25k £46.23k £46.39k £53.84k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £239.38k £152.87k £173.98k £163.45k £25.24k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Own use assets £42.70m £42.25m £43.11m £59.75m £60.44m
Long-term investments £39.50m £43.11m £35.93m £35.80m £37.79m
Other assets £8.21m £10.71m £17.51m £1.73m £3.56m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£2.54m -£2.06m -£1.22m -£1.08m -£693.70k
Total liabilities £14.20m £14.17m £14.33m £14.37m £14.59m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 31 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 31 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 29 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 29 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 21 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 21 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 25 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 25 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 22 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 22 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
DARWIN COLLEGE
CAMBRIDGE
CB3 9EU
Phone:
01223335660