Financial history ACCESS DORSET LTD

Charity number: 1142171
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £264.87k £292.04k £291.22k £226.07k £215.27k
Total expenditure £284.10k £232.03k £229.88k £226.79k £196.37k
Income from government contracts £58.92k £10.31k N/A £9.46k £9.46k
Income from government grants £0 £500 £8.88k N/A N/A