Accounts and annual returns NOTTINGHAM SOCIETY OF ARTISTS LTD

Charity number: 1143205
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 14 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 14 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 11 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window