Financial history NOTTINGHAM SOCIETY OF ARTISTS LTD

Charity number: 1143205
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £29.43k £29.78k £27.43k £29.16k £76.36k
Total expenditure £30.79k £19.38k £33.04k £24.50k £43.64k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £42.00k