FRIENDS OF KENSAL RISE LIBRARY LIMITED

Charity number: 1141606
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £104.82k £108.08k £92.31k £52.01k £42.57k
Total expenditure £6.87k £187.92k £48.43k £59.71k £36.81k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £90.50k £59.78k £23.61k £37.15k