FRIENDS OF KENSAL RISE LIBRARY LIMITED

Charity number: 1141606
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Marina Valles Trustee 14 September 2020 None on record
Carole Buck Trustee 22 February 2017 None on record
MARK FISHER Trustee 11 February 2013 None on record
Margaret Bailey Chair 05 April 2011 None on record
JONATHAN BERTULIS-FERNANDEZ Trustee 05 April 2011 None on record
Maria Balinska Trustee 14 September 2020 None on record
Adam Charles Green Trustee 19 November 2019 None on record
KYLE CLARK Trustee 13 February 2014 None on record
JOHN PATRICK WALSH Trustee 05 April 2011 None on record