Financial history THE MARE AND FOAL SANCTUARY

Charity number: 1141831
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £4.48m £6.07m £4.94m £4.64m £6.12m
Total expenditure £3.46m £4.05m £4.58m £5.10m £4.91m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A £937 N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £331.19k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.79m £5.36m £4.37m £4.19m £5.64m
Income - Other trading activities £623.92k £644.51k £487.22k £373.62k £392.75k
Income - Charitable activities £28.03k £21.50k £15.07k £15.70k £25.82k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £43.21k £47.71k £68.93k £59.74k £64.04k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £1.43m £2.89m £2.10m £1.69m £3.32m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.84m £2.51m £3.02m £3.74m £3.60m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.61m £1.54m £1.56m £1.36m £1.31m
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £12.25k £18.81k £19.87k £20.28k £22.12k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0