THE HALL HUNTER FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
During the year, donations were made from the Farm Fund to Eastern European good causes in Romania, Poland and Bulgaria. Payments were also made to local good causes within 10 to 15 miles of the HHP sites at Wokingham, Twyford and Godalming. 56 donations were made from the Partners Fund to a variety of Local and National charitable organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 25 May 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK HALL | Trustee | 05 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARY HALL | Trustee | 05 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
Harry Hall | Trustee | 05 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £116.21k | £333.07k | £324.00k | £199.69k | £254.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £134.08k | £327.01k | £318.80k | £204.94k | £254.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 June 2024 | 126 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 June 2024 | 126 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31/03/2011
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE INCOME OF THE TRUST FOR GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THEY DETERMINE AT THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hall Hunter Partnership
Heathlands Farm
Honey Hill
WOKINGHAM
RG40 3BH
- Phone:
- 01183094609
- Email:
- info@hallhunter.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window