Accounts and annual returns DYSLECSIA CYMRU / WALES DYSLEXIA

Charity number: 1141416
Charity reporting is overdue by 322 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2022 Overdue Overdue by 322 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Overdue Overdue by 322 days
Annual return 31 October 2021 07 September 2022 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 28 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 28 August 2021 362 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 10 November 2020 71 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2018 05 January 2020 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required