THE REPRESENTATIVE BODY OF THE CHURCH IN WALES

Charity number: 1142813
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

23 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sir Evan Paul Silk Trustee 15 November 2017
SWANSEA AND BRECON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE Received: On time
BRECKNOCK SOCIETY AND MUSEUM FRIENDS CYMDEITHAS BRYCHEINIOG A CHYFEILLION YR AMGUEDDFA Received: On time
CHRIST COLLEGE, BRECON Received: On time
THE LLANGASTY RETREAT HOUSE TRUST
CWMDU WATER UNDERTAKING Received: On time
HANSARD SOCIETY LIMITED Received: On time
Jane Heard Trustee 01 January 2021 None on record
Dr Sian Miller Trustee 08 July 2021
SWANSEA AND BRECON DIOCESAN BOARD FOR SOCIAL RESPONSIBILITY Received: On time
The Wellbeing Project Brecon Received: On time
ATHRAWDY HOUSE Received: On time
PETER EVANS LEA Trustee 31 October 2015
MISS RACHEL HERBERT'S CHURCH PARSONAGE AND ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES Received: On time
THE WIDOWS, ORPHANS AND DEPENDANTS SOCIETY OF THE CHURCH IN WALES Received: On time
Nick Griffin Trustee 02 December 2015
LAMPETER VELFREY COMMUNITY AND PLAYING FIELD ASSOCIATION Overdue by 201 days
ST DAVIDS DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE Received: On time
RODERICK DAVIES Trustee 01 January 2015
LECTURESHIP ENDOWMENT OF EDWARD LEWIS Received: On time
GEOFFREY IAN MOSES Trustee 19 April 2011 None on record
JOHN JAMES TURNER Chair 19 April 2011
Saint Melangell Shrine Church and Centre Recently registered
THE ST MELANGELL CENTRE Received: On time
CASTLE CAEREINION UNITED CHARITIES Received: On time
POOL MISSION AREA Received: 124 days late
The Venerable Michael Komor Trustee 01 January 2021
THE DEAN AND CHAPTER OF LLANDAFF CATHEDRAL Received: On time
CHARITY OF HENRY JOHN RANDALL Received: On time
HELEN Rosemary JONES Trustee 19 September 2017
THE WIDOWS, ORPHANS AND DEPENDANTS SOCIETY OF THE CHURCH IN WALES Received: On time
THE ST ASAPH DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE Received: On time
Judith Hayward Trustee 05 November 2018 None on record
Rev NIGEL WILLIAMS Trustee 25 September 2018
THE GOODMAN AND RUTHIN CHARITY Received: On time
FRIENDS OF ST ASAPH CATHEDRAL Received: On time
THE DEAN AND CHAPTER OF ST ASAPH CATHEDRAL Received: On time
PAULETTE ROSEMARY BROWN Trustee 03 May 2012
MONMOUTH DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE Received: On time
LET THE CHILDREN LIVE! Received: On time
HILARY MAY WISEMAN RD Trustee 01 January 2018 None on record
The Venerable Mary Kathleen Rose Stallard Trustee 27 February 2020
MAECYMRU MERCHED A'R EGLWYS Received: On time
BANGOR DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE BWRDD CYLLID ESGOBAETH BANGOR Received: On time
THE OPEN THEOLOGY TRUST Received: On time
BANGOR DIOCESAN TRUST Received: On time
Revd Canon PAUL MACKNESS Trustee 01 January 2018
ST DAVIDS DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE Received: On time
THOMAS OWEN SAUNDERS LLOYD Trustee 22 October 2012
THE HIGH SHERIFF OF DYFED YOUNG PERSONS CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
ABERGLASNEY RESTORATION TRUST Received: On time
THE VENERABLE ALAN NEIL JEVONS Trustee 05 February 2013
SWANSEA AND BRECON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE Received: On time
SWANSEA AND BRECON DIOCESAN TRUST (INCORPORATED) Received: 48 days late
The Wellbeing Project Brecon Received: On time
SWANSEA AND BRECON DIOCESAN BOARD FOR SOCIAL RESPONSIBILITY Received: On time
CHRIST COLLEGE, BRECON Received: On time
THE LLANGASTY RETREAT HOUSE TRUST
VENERABLE JONATHAN SIMON WILLIAMS Trustee 11 September 2012
MONMOUTH DIOCESAN TRUST Received: On time
MONMOUTH DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE Received: On time
CWMBRAN BAROQUE SINGERS Received: On time
THE WIDOWS, ORPHANS AND DEPENDANTS SOCIETY OF THE CHURCH IN WALES Received: On time
THE MONMOUTH DIOCESAN CLERGY WIDOWS & DEPENDANTS SOCIETY Received: On time
ST WOOLOS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Overdue by 352 days
John Mcinnes Watson Trustee 01 January 2021 None on record
Dr Hywel John Parry-Smith Trustee 01 January 2021
BANGOR DIOCESAN TRUST Received: On time
GARN FAWR FUEL ALLOTMENT Received: On time
BANGOR DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE BWRDD CYLLID ESGOBAETH BANGOR Received: On time
PETER DUNCAN KENNEDY Trustee 01 August 2017 None on record
MICHAEL LAWLEY Trustee 27 July 2017
THE LLANGASTY RETREAT HOUSE TRUST