Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARGARET'S, PUTNEY
Charity number: 1143534

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Roberts | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Crane | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sally Russell | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Humphrey Roberts | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ann Grieves | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Brutus Green | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Cooper | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ben Speedy | Trustee | 30 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mark Raymond Steward | Trustee | 28 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
James Andrew Campbell Gairdner | Trustee | 28 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY HAWKSLEY F.C.A. | Trustee | 15 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANNE EAST | Trustee | 15 July 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.