THE CHRISTCHURCH EARTHQUAKE APPEAL (UK)

Charity number: 1141365
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

On February 22 2011 a 6.3 magnitude struck the city of Christchurch in the Canterbury region in New Zealand causing widespread damage and loss of life. The charity supports fundraising for Christchurch in the United Kingdom and allocates those funds to earthquake recovery initiatives in the region in a number of areas of need including hardship, education, religion, and recreation and leisure.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2014

Total income: £18,160
Total expenditure: £338,374

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London
  • New Zealand

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 April 2011: Standard registration
  • 21 September 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • CEA UK (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2012 30/04/2013 30/04/2014
Total gross income £1.15m £98.57k £18.16k
Total expenditure £357.20k £364.99k £338.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.13m N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £9.05k N/A N/A
Income - Other £11.73k N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £340.10k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £8.11k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £340.10k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 October 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 30 October 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2014 28 February 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2014 10 February 2015 On Time