Trustees EDGE HILL STUDENTS' UNION LIMITED
Charity number: 1143764
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Marie Ellis | Chair | 25 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Maggie Man Wai Lam | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Antonnette Mapesa | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Orna Murphy-Horton | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eri Mountbatten-O'Malley | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bill Hancox | Trustee | 18 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Colin Dyas | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.