THE SANGHAPADIPA TEMPLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. To advance the Buddhist religion in the Welsh Valleys, South, Mid,West Wales and elsewhere when required or requested. 1.1 To Advance the education of the public in the beliefs and traditions of the Buddhist religion and in the subject of Thai Culture
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 17 May 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHRA SUTAS PHUANGPHUA | Chair | 14 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANUWAT KHEMTHONG | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Shepherd | Trustee | 03 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Samai Davies | Trustee | 20 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
NONGLAK DONOVAN | Trustee | 03 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHUTHARAT MORGAN | Trustee | 17 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £119.51k | £55.24k | £25.49k | £80.90k | £89.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.43k | £30.04k | £19.03k | £49.95k | £68.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 15 March 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 15 March 2024 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 24 May 2023 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 24 May 2023 | 85 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 28 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 28 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TrustDeed
Charitable objects
2. TO ADVANCE THE BUDDHIST RELIGION IN THE WELSH VALLEYS. SOUTH. ,MID. WEST WALES AND ELSEWHERE WHEN REQUIRED OR REQUESTED. 2.1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE BELIEFS AND TRADITIONS OF THE BUDDHIST RELIGION AND IN THE SUBJECT OF THAI CULTURE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tree Tops
Pengwern Road
Clase
Swansea
SA6 7LW
- Phone:
- 01792700342
- Email:
- pimmorgan@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window