Accounts and annual returns MEND THE GAP

Charity number: 1143419
Charity reporting is up to date (24 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2022 23 August 2023 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 19 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 19 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 15 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 04 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 04 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 27 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 27 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window