MEND THE GAP

Charity number: 1143419
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £22.98k £38.19k £53.43k £48.62k £22.08k
Total expenditure £24.29k £38.17k £53.36k £49.96k £22.42k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £5.00k