SAVE THE CONGO
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Governance
- 12 December 2011: Standard registration
- 09 October 2014: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 14 April 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 14 April 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 14 April 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 14 April 2013 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/07/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/11/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18/11/2011
Charitable objects
1. THE PROMOTION OF HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) IN THE DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF CONGO (AND WIDER EAST AND CENTRAL AFRICAN REGION) BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A)OBTAINING REDRESS FOR THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; (B)RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; (C)CONDUCTING RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; (D)EDUCATING THE PUBLIC ABOUT HUMAN RIGHTS; (E)RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES. IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT BUT NOT OTHERWISE THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER TO ENGAGE IN POLITICAL ACTIVITY PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES ARE SATISFIED THAT THE PROPOSED ACTIVITIES WILL FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY TO AN EXTENT JUSTIFIED BY THE RESOURCES COMMITTED AND THE ACTIVITY IS NOT THE DOMINANT MEANS BY WHICH THE CHARITY CARRIES OUT ITS OBJECTS. 2.THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF CONGO BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AT SCHOOLS. 3.THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH IN THE DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF CONGO BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND SERVICES INCLUDING HEALTH EDUCATION PROGRAMMES. 4.TO PROMOTE EQUALITY BETWEEN MEN AND WOMEN IN THE DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF CONGO AND TO ELIMINATE GENDER DISCRIMINATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF CONGO, EAST AND CENTRAL AFRICA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window