KARIMIA ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1143245
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £843.69k £945.85k £995.57k £898.69k £871.73k
Total expenditure £745.82k £803.87k £797.79k £885.48k £857.82k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £194.74k £191.58k £215.99k £227.15k
Income - Donations and legacies £843.69k £698.85k £991.40k £783.60k £651.16k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £4.06k £2.65k £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £185.45k £0 £111.39k £219.95k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £110 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £61.56k £0 £1.05k £612
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £745.82k £797.50k £788.21k £879.48k £836.54k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £6.37k £9.58k £6.00k £21.28k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £43.42k £0 £0 £29.28k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0