PRESTATYN PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL

Charity Number: 1141717
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The provision of regular public worship; The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation; Pastoral work including visiting the sick and bereaved; Teaching of Christianity through sermons and small groups; Taking of assemblies in local schools; The provision of a youth club with Christian ethos; promoting the whole mission of the Church in Wales.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017

Total income: £73,213
Total expenditure: £84,532

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Denbighshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 May 2011: Standard registration
  • 28 March 2020: Removed (Amalgamated)
  • 28 March 2020: Funds transferred to 1177549 BRYN A MÔR MISSION AREA
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • NO (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017
Total gross income £97.36k £129.00k £101.47k £89.21k £73.21k
Total expenditure £110.38k £116.74k £100.35k £89.14k £84.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2017 23 July 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 23 July 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2016 16 September 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 16 September 2017 On Time