FOR LIFE TRUST

Charity number: 1143950
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 28 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 28 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 19 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 19 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 25 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 25 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2016 28 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 28 February 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2015 14 December 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2015 14 December 2015 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)