FOR LIFE TRUST

Charity number: 1143950
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/04/2015 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £181.66k £94.68k £111.75k £81.74k £102.36k
Total expenditure £176.76k £98.11k £111.32k £78.60k £109.41k