FOR LIFE TRUST

Charity number: 1143950
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LYDIA GEORGE Trustee 25 July 2015
FOR LIFE Charity reporting is up to date
Patrick Daly Trustee 03 November 2020 None on record
Christine Bryan Trustee 18 June 2020 None on record
HENRY GEORGE Trustee 21 August 2007 None on record
Justine Clair Clifford Trustee 25 July 2015 None on record
Robert Whitelaw Trustee 01 November 2020 None on record
OLUBUKOLA MARCINKOWSKI Trustee 16 December 2015
FOR LIFE Charity reporting is up to date