Accounts and annual returns ERIDGE RDA LIMITED

Charity number: 1143556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2021 09 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2020 23 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 25 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2018 23 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2017 14 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 Not Required