Financial history ERIDGE RDA LIMITED

Charity number: 1143556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021
Total gross income £5.39k £6.07k £4.01k £3.43k £1.89k
Total expenditure £7.73k £6.60k £7.64k £4.92k £4.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A