Trustees ERIDGE RDA LIMITED

Charity number: 1143556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JANE LOM Chair 16 August 2011
None on record
Linda Charlton Trustee 21 October 2019
None on record
Sara Vartan Trustee 03 November 2014
None on record
Joanna Macintyre Trustee 03 November 2014
None on record
CHARLOTTE PURKIS Trustee 27 September 2013
None on record
BARBARA JARMAN Trustee 27 September 2013
None on record
MARY POVEY Trustee 01 November 2012
None on record
BRIDGYD RICHARDS Trustee 26 August 2011
None on record