Trustees FRIENDS OF ST ANDREW'S CHURCH,HEADINGTON

Charity number: 1147577
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JUDY PAYNE Chair 30 June 2011
None on record
Dr Jane Ellen Elizabeth Shepherd Trustee 21 November 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREWS, OLD HEADINGTON
Received: On time
Malcolm Nichols Trustee 13 May 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREWS, OLD HEADINGTON
Received: On time
Peter Stanley McCarter Trustee 10 March 2014
None on record
HUGH FERRIS Trustee 30 July 2013
ST ANDREW'S PARISH HALL
Received: On time
RICHARD GLEDHILL Trustee 30 July 2013
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREWS, OLD HEADINGTON
Received: On time
HEADINGTON PARISH CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev DARREN WILLIAM MCFARLAND Trustee 20 July 2012
OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREWS, OLD HEADINGTON
Received: On time
NATACHA FERNANDE HUGGETT Trustee 30 June 2011
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREWS, OLD HEADINGTON
Received: On time
BRUCE WILLIAM HUGGETT Trustee 30 June 2011
None on record
MR TIM CADEL Trustee 30 June 2011
None on record