CALVARY CHAPEL CAMBRIDGE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christian Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 27 April 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Richard Peat | Chair | 14 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Shiralee Cornell | Trustee | 05 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Piers Cornell | Trustee | 05 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Iain Norman | Trustee | 05 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Robert Higgins | Trustee | 28 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.03k | £55.59k | £90.71k | £53.72k | £77.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.95k | £50.93k | £64.28k | £69.66k | £72.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 08 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 08 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 03 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 03 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 20 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 20 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/04/2011
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIANITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE FOLLOWING: A. TO WORSHIP GOD THE FATHER, SON AND HOLY SPIRIT; B TO BUILD UP THE CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE TEACHING AND PREACHING OF THE WORD OF GOD (THE BIBLE); C. TO PROCLAIM THAT MEN AND WOMEN SHOULD REPENT AND BELIEVE IN JESUS CHRIST AS SAVIOUR AND LORD; D. AS WE HAVE OPPORTUNITY, TO DO GOOD TO ALL, ESPECIALLY TO THOSE WHO ARE OF THE HOUSEHOLD OF FAITH (GALATIANS 6:10).
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
North Arbury Chapel
54 Cameron Road
CAMBRIDGE
CB4 2LY
- Phone:
- 07511 216305
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window