Trustees DEEPINGS YOUTH GROUP

Charity number: 1142801
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jayne Reed Chair 15 September 2018
None on record
Sarah Olson Trustee 20 April 2022
None on record
Trevor Paul Smith Trustee 17 February 2022
None on record
LISA CUTHBERT Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Judy Stevens Trustee 15 September 2018
None on record
Paul Neville Hanson Trustee 15 September 2015
None on record
Xanthe Judith Collins Trustee 25 June 2014
None on record