INFOSOUND

Charity number: 1142082
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 10 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 16 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 07 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 07 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 31 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 31 August 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 12 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015

( These accounts
have been qualified)

12 July 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)