Financial history INFOSOUND

Charity number: 1142082
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £70.28k £60.64k £34.04k £9.27k £17.90k
Total expenditure £50.35k £46.17k £43.70k £43.76k £43.30k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A