ST CLEOPAS 468 COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity number: 1144511
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £42.47k £13.46k £36.16k £13.99k £0
Total expenditure £81.08k £61.81k £51.68k £24.63k £2.66k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A