ST CLEOPAS 468 COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity number: 1144511
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Vicky Malone Trustee 01 April 2013 None on record
RACHEL ELIZABETH SHAW READ Trustee 03 November 2011 None on record
Jonathan Conn Chair 01 April 2013 None on record
Jeremy Wright Trustee 01 July 2016 None on record
Dorothy Williams Trustee 01 April 2018 None on record
Chelsea Whittaker Trustee 01 July 2017 None on record