SPORTING KHALSA COMMUNITY FACILITIES LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Sporting Khalsa Community Facilities aim is to inspire future generations to build better communities for all. Providing sports facilities to use sport to educate, motivate and inspire youngsters and adults.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Walsall
Governance
- 02 June 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TARLAZ DOSNAJH | Trustee | 02 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
BALBIR SINGH | Trustee | 04 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Manjit Singh Gill | Trustee | 04 May 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £143.41k | £91.46k | £123.40k | £79.97k | £355.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.37k | £90.62k | £93.35k | £80.11k | £119.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 April 2024 | 90 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 April 2024 | 90 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 March 2023 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 September 2022 | 226 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 September 2022 | 226 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 March 2021 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 March 2021 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23/05/2011
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WALSALL BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING A VARIETY OF SPORTS INCLUDING FIVE-A-SIDE FOOTBALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
GLOBE HOUSE
3 BRADFORD PLACE
WALSALL
WEST MIDLNDS
WS11PL
- Phone:
- 01902 475105
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window