CHRIST CHURCH STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1142619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £1.19m £1.26m £989.20k £1.02m £798.12k
Total expenditure £1.24m £1.22m £966.03k £962.33k £713.74k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £25.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £910.76k £958.19k £761.36k £796.83k £723.78k
Income - Other trading activities £145.09k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £78.29k £298.45k £227.12k £224.74k £72.62k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £76 £131 £719 £1.64k £1.73k
Income - Other £59.43k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.24m £1.22m £954.28k £952.25k £712.46k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £11.75k £10.09k £1.28k
Expenditure - Governance £11.77k £20.29k £56.91k £0 £49.31k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0