Trustees CATHOLIC VOCATIONS PROJECT
Charity number: 1142601
Charity reporting is overdue by 1031 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sister Theresa Tighe Sr | Chair | 02 January 2016 |
|
|||||||||
Rev James Hayes ficp | Trustee | 16 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Frances Kelly CSN | Trustee | 11 December 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev John McGowan OCD | Trustee | 08 December 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Very Rev Fr Richard Reid CSsR | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|||||||||
REV DR MARTIN GERARD POULSOM SDB | Trustee | 27 June 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.